Council Decision of 24 September 2004 — Renewal of the membership of the European Social Fund Committee - Main contents
12.10.2005 |
EN |
Official Journal of the European Union |
C 252/1 |
COUNCIL DECISION
of 24 September 2004
Renewal of the membership of the European Social Fund Committee
(2005/C 252/01)
THE COUNCIL OF THE EUROPEAN UNION,
Having regard to the Treaty establishing the European Community and in particular Article 147 thereof,
Having regard to the Act concerning the conditions of accession of the Czech Republic, the Republic of Estonia, the Republic of Cyprus, the Republic of Latvia, the Republic of Lithuania, the Republic of Hungary, the Republic of Malta, the Republic of Poland, the Republic of Slovenia and the Slovak Republic and the adjustments to the Treaties on which the European Union is founded (1), and in particular Article 52(3) and Annex XVIII thereof,
Having regard to Council Regulation (EC) No 1260/1999 of 21 June 1999 laying down general provisions on the Structural Funds (2) and in particular the third subparagraph of Article 49(1) thereof,
Having regard to the proposal from the Commission,
Whereas:
(1) |
Under the Council Decision of 8 October 2001 appointing the members of the Committee referred to in Article 147 of the EC Treaty (3), the term of office of those members expires on 22 October 2004. |
(2) |
The Act of Accession provides that the membership of the European Social Fund Committee shall be completely renewed upon accession. |
(3) |
The members and alternate members of the Committee referred to in Article 147 of the Treaty should therefore be appointed for a period of three years, |
HAS DECIDED AS FOLLOWS:
Article 1
The persons listed in the annex are hereby appointed members and alternate members of the European Social Fund Committee for the period 1 May 2004 to 30 April 2007.
Article 2
This Decision shall be published, for information, in the Official Journal of the European Union.
Done at Brussels, 24 September 2004.
For the Council
The President
-
L.J. BRINKHORST
-
OJ L 161, 26.6.1999, p. 1. Regulation as last amended by the Act of Accession.
ANNEX
Member State |
Representing |
Member |
|
Austria |
Government |
Member |
Mr Alfred HALLER |
Government |
Member |
Mr Michael FÖRSCHNER |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Ms Ulrike REBHANDL |
|
Employers |
Member |
Ms Maria KAUN |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Wolfgang TRITREMMEL |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Ms Christa SCHWENG |
|
Workers |
Member |
Ms Silvia HOFBAUER |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Franz FRIEHS |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Mr Ludwig ROITHINGER |
|
Belgium |
Government |
Member |
Mr Dominik ROLAND |
Government |
Member |
Ms Maryse CHABEAU |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Ms Annemie PERNOT |
|
Employers |
Member |
Ms Sonja KOHNENMERGEN |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Robrecht BOTHUYNE |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Mr Werner ABELHAUSEN |
|
Workers |
Member |
Ms Ann WOUTERS |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Hervé DECUYPER |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Ms Vera DOS SANTOS COSTA |
|
Cyprus |
Government |
Member |
Mr Ioannis MODITIS |
Government |
Member |
Mr Alexandros ALEXANDROU |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Mr George HORRATAS |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr George PANTELIDES |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Emilios MICHAEL |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Mr Michael ANTONIOU |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Nikos MOISEOS |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Andreas PAVLIKAS |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Mr Diomedes DIOMEDOUS |
|
Czech Republic |
Government |
Member |
Mr Frantisek KONICEK |
Government |
Member |
Ms Iva SOLCOVA |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Mr Thomas KUCHTÍK |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Jiri KOHOUTEK |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Jiri SVOBODA |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Ms Vladimira DRBALOVA |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Zdenek MALEK |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Pavel JANICKO |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Ms Hana MALKOVA |
|
Denmark |
Government |
Member |
Ms Marina NØRLYNG |
Government |
Member |
Mr Allan PHILIPS |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Mr Henning ERIKSEN |
|
Employers |
Member |
Ms Lise SKANTING |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Henning GADE |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Mr Jørgen BANG PETERSEN |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Kim KNUDSEN |
|
Workers |
Member |
Ms Lisbeth WILSTER |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Mr Tyge GROES |
|
Estonia |
Government |
Member |
Ms Kertu SAKS |
Government |
Member |
Ms Annemari PÄLL |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Ms Merlin ORGLA |
|
Employers |
Member |
Ms Eve PÄÄRENDSON |
|
Employers |
Member |
Ms Aire MILL |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Ms Ruta KRUUDA |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Harri TALIGA |
|
Workers |
Member |
Ms Mare VIIES |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Ms Liina CARR |
|
France |
Government |
Member |
Mr Bertrand GAUDIN |
Government |
Member |
Mr Jean-François CHEVALLERAU |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Mr Stéphane SAUREL |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr François TRAISNEL |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Philippe GARZON |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Ms Alexandra DENIS |
|
Workers |
Member |
Ms Marie-France BOUTROUE |
|
Workers |
Member |
Ms Huguette BRUNEL |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Mr Jean-Jacques DANIS |
|
Germany |
Government |
Member |
Mr Günter WINKLER |
Government |
Member |
Ms Inken KLASSEN |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Mr Christian KONOW |
|
Employers |
Member |
Alexandra-Friederike Prinzessin zu SCHOENAICH-CAROLATH |
|
Employers |
Member |
Ms Ilka HOUBEN |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Ms Alexandra HÖRDER |
|
Workers |
Member |
Ms Inge KAUFMANN |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Jochen LAUX |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Mr Ingo KOLF |
|
Greece |
Government |
Member |
Ms Anna DALAPORTA |
Government |
Member |
Mr Konstantinos MAGAS |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Ms Ourania ANTHOPOULOU |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Labros PAPAIOANNOU |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Petros GIANNOULOPOULOS |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Ms Ioanna PAPAYANNI |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Dimitris TSOUKALAS |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Panagiotis POLYMENAKOS |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Mr Vassilis PAPADOGAMBROS |
|
Hungary |
Government |
Member |
Ms Judit RÓZSA |
Government |
Member |
Ms Renáta TÓTH |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Ms Erzsébet BUDAVÁRI |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Antal CSUPORT |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr István WIMMER |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Mr László KRISÁN |
|
Workers |
Member |
Ms Erzsébet HANTI |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr László KOZÁK |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Ms Edit PINK |
|
Ireland |
Government |
Member |
Mr William PARNELL |
Government |
Member |
Mr John HUGHES |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Mr Eamonn BALMER |
|
Employers |
Member |
Ms Maria CRONIN |
|
Employers |
Member |
Ms Heidi LOUGHEED |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Mr Arthur FORBES |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Dan MURPHY |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Noirin GREENE |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Mr Jim DORNEY |
|
Italy |
Government |
Member |
Ms Aviana BULGARELLI |
Government |
Member |
Ms Silvana AMADORI |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Ms Alessandra TOMAI |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Claudio GENTILI |
|
Employers |
Member |
Ms Eleonora PISICCHIO |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Ms Silvia CIUFFINI |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Graziano TRERÈ |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Roberto PETTENELLO |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Ms Maria Antonietta TIMI |
|
Latvia |
Government |
Member |
Mr Andžs ŪBELIS |
Government |
Member |
Ms Elita MILČA |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Ms Inta GEIBA |
|
Employers |
Member |
Ms Elīna EGLE |
|
Employers |
Member |
Ms Daiga ERMSONE |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Ms Anita NIPĀNE |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Pēteris KRĪGERS |
|
Workers |
Member |
Ms Iveta OZOLA |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Ms Irina HOMKO |
|
Lithuania |
Government |
Member |
Ms Nijolė MACKEVIČIENĖ |
Government |
Member |
Ms Jekaterina ŠARMAVIČIENĖ |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Mr Aurimas MORKŪNAS |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Egidijus KASELIS |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Vaidotas LEVICKAS |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Ms Laura SIRVYDIENĖ |
|
Workers |
Member |
Ms Daiva KVĖDARAITĖ |
|
Workers |
Member |
Ms Irena PETRAITIENĖ |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Ms Janina ŠVEDIENĖ |
|
Luxembourg |
Government |
Member |
Ms Maryse FISCH |
Government |
Member |
Mr Jeannot BERG |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Ms Chantal FANDEL |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr François ENGELS |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Romain LANNERS |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Ms Christiane BERTRAND-SCHAUL |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr René PIZZAFERRI |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Roby SCHADECK |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Ms Viviane GOERGEN |
|
Malta |
Government |
Member |
Mr Edward GRIMA BALDACCHINO |
Government |
Member |
Ms Alison SCERRI |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Ms Sue VELLA |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Vincent FARRUGIA |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Joseph FARRUGIA |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Mr John SCICLUNA |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Emmanuel MICALLEF |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr William PORTELLI |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Mr Charles MAGRO |
|
Netherlands |
Government |
Member |
Mr Louis GEELHOED |
Government |
Member |
Ms Korrie LOUWES |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Ms Vanessa MONFILS |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Hans KOOLE |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr André VAN DER LEEST |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Ms L. M. VAN HOOGSTRATEN-VAN EMBDEN ANDRES |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Arjan PLOEGMAKERS |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr R.C. ROELOFSE |
|
Poland |
Government |
Member |
Ms Adriana NIEDOSZEWSKA |
Government |
Member |
Mr Piotr STRONKOWSKI |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Ms Anna MICKIEWICZ |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Andrzej JANKOWSKI |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Wiesław SINKIEWICZ |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Ms Magda KOPCZYNSKA |
|
Workers |
Member |
Ms Katarzyna SOSNOWSKA |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Michał MENES |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Ms Agata BARANOWSKA-GRYCUK |
|
Portugal |
Government |
Member |
Mr António VALADAS DA SILVA |
Government |
Member |
Mr Luís COSTA |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Mr José REALINHO DE MATOS |
|
Employers |
Member |
Ms Clara GUERREIRO |
|
Employers |
Member |
Ms Helena LEAL |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Mr António ABRANTES |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Eugénio Óscar GARCIA DA ROSA |
|
Workers |
Member |
Ms Maria Leonor MALTEZ PARREIRA CORTEZ DOS SANTOS |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Ms Ana Paula MATA BERNARDO |
|
Spain |
Government |
Member |
Ms Carlos TORTUERO MARTIN |
Government |
Member |
Mr Gonzalo GÓMEZ DE VILLALOBOS |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Mr Miguel COLINA ROBLEDO |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr José Isaías RODRIGUEZ GARCIA CARO |
|
Employers |
Member |
Ms Begoña MORTON |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Ms Ana BELTRÁN BLÁSQUEZ |
|
Workers |
Member |
Ms Ana HERMOSO |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Luis GALIANO RÁBAGO |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Ms Laura GONZÁLEZ DE TXABARRI |
|
Slovakia |
Government |
Member |
Ms Andrea KOSTOLNÁ |
Government |
Member |
Mr Ivan HROMADA |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Ms Anna NOGOVÁ |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Peter MASARYK |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Daniel HRDINA |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Ms Viola KROMEROVÁ |
|
Workers |
Member |
Ms Jozefa ŠVIRECOVÁ |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Milan BUŠO |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Ms Margita ANČICOVÁ |
|
Slovenia |
Government |
Member |
Ms Staša BALOH PLAHUTNIK |
Government |
Member |
Ms Nastja STERGAR |
|
Government |
Alternate |
… |
|
Employers |
Member |
Ms Janja MEGLIČ |
|
Employers |
Member |
Ms Nina GLOBOČNIK |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Ms Sonja SPOLJARIČ |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Jure SNOJ |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Stane KOŠIR |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Mr Jurij AHAČIČ |
|
Finland |
Government |
Member |
Mr Pertti TOIVONEN |
Government |
Member |
Ms Merja NIEMI |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Ms Eeva-Liisa KOIVUNEVA |
|
Employers |
Member |
Ms Riitta WÄRN |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Heikki SÚOMALAINEN |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Mr Jukka AHTELA |
|
Workers |
Member |
Ms Eine MIKKONEN |
|
Workers |
Member |
Ms Mervi HUUSKONEN |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Mr Heikki LIEDE |
|
Sweden |
Government |
Member |
Ms Mari MILD |
Government |
Member |
Mr Ingmar PAULSSON |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Mr Lars STENSTRÖM |
|
Employers |
Member |
Ms Gunilla SAHLIN |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Torgny LJUNGQVIST |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Ms Vivi JACOBSON LIBIETIS |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Thomas FREDEN |
|
Workers |
Member |
Ms Erika KJELLSTRAND |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Ms Charlotta KRAFFT |
|
United Kingdom |
Government |
Member |
Mr Gordon PURSGLOVE |
Government |
Member |
Mr Ken LAMBERT |
|
Government |
Alternate |
Mr Tim FIGURES |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Anthony THOMPSON |
|
Employers |
Member |
Mr Martin MORTON |
|
Employers |
Alternate |
Ms Anne LINDSAY |
|
Workers |
Member |
Mr Alan MANNING |
|
Workers |
Member |
Ms Liz SMITH |
|
Workers |
Alternate |
Mr Joe FEARNEHOUGH |
This summary has been adopted from EUR-Lex.